Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7151
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7151
Title:Curtis John Mulhern, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:December 20, 2018
Lower Ct:Superior Court of Pennsylvania, Harrisburg Office
   Case Numbers:(1546 MDA 2016)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 30, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Feb 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Curtis MulhernMR-5655
PO Box 33028
St. Petersburg, FL 33733

Party name: Curtis J. Mulhern

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543