Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-7105
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-7105
Title:Tavaris Jemario Hunter, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15206)
   Decision Date:September 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019.
Feb 19 2019Brief of respondent United States of America filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 11 2019Rescheduled.
Apr 02 2019Reply of petitioner Tavaris Hunter filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Tavaris Hunter
Peter Vincent BirchFederal Public Defender
450 Australian Avenue, South
Suite 500
West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Peter_Birch@fd.org
5618336288
Party name: Tavaris Hunter
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543