Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-706
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-706
Title:Esther Kiobel, By and Through Her Attorney-In-Fact, Channa Samkalden, Petitioner
v.
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
Docketed:November 30, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-424-cv)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Waiver of right of respondent Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marco Benjamin Simons
    Counsel of Record
EarthRights International
1612 K Street N.W.
#401
Washington, DC 20006

marco@earthrights.org
202-466-5188
Party name: Esther Kiobel
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543