Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-705
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-705
Title:Wendell Griffen, Judge, Sixth Judicial Circuit, Pulaski County, Arkansas, Petitioner
v.
John Dan Kemp, Chief Justice, Arkansas Supreme Court, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1864)
   Decision Date:July 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Courtney Hudson Goodson to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent John Kemp to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Karen Baker to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Justice Rhonda Wood to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent Honorable Josephine L. Hart to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Respondents
Timothy O. Dudley
    Counsel of Record
Tim Dudley, Ltd.
114 S. Pulaski
Little Rock, AR 72201

TODudley@swbell.net
501 372 0080
Party name: Karen Baker
Robert L. Henry III
    Counsel of Record
Barber Law Firm, PLLC
425 West Capitol Ave., Suite 3400
Little Rock, AR 72201

rhenry@barberlawfirm.com
501-372-6175
Party name: Honorable Josephine L. Hart
Christopher O. Murray
    Counsel of Record
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP
410 17th Street, Suite 2200
Denver, CO 80202

cmurray@bhfs.com
303-223-1100
Party name: Justice Rhonda Wood
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, P.C.
455 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 152
Washington, DC 20001

robert.peck@cclfirm.com
2029442874
Party name: John Kemp
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dhthompson98@gmail.com
202-220-9600
Party name: Courtney Hudson Goodson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543