Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-704
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-704
Title:Ross Abbott, et al., Petitioners
v.
Harris Pastides, et al.
Docketed:November 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1853)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Ross Abbott, et al..
Blanket Consent
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 31, 2018 to January 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 30, 2019.
Dec 26 2018Amicus brief of FIRST AMENDMENT CLINICS AT DUKE LAW AND ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY LAW not accepted for filing. (December 28, 2018)(Corrected version submitted)
Dec 26 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by First Amendment Clinics at Duke Law, et al. (12/27/2018)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The South Carolina ACLU, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Response of Pastides, et al. to motion not accepted for filing. (January 08, 2019)
Jan 03 2019Response in opposition to motion to file amici curiae brief of First Amendment Clinics at Duke Law, et al. from respondents Harris Pastides, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Response in opposition to motion to file amici curiae brief of South Carolina ACLU, et al. from respondents Harris Pastides, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Brief of respondents Harris Pastides, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Reply of petitioners Ross Abbott, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 04 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by First Amendment Clinics at Duke Law, et al. GRANTED.
Mar 04 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by the South Carolina ACLU, et al. GRANTED.
Mar 04 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Ross Abbott, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth P. Woodington
    Counsel of Record
Davidson, Wren & Plyler, P.A.
PO Box 8568
Columbia, SC 29202

kwoodington@dml-law.com
803-806-8222
Party name: Harris Pastides, et al.
Other
Robert D Kamenshine
    Counsel of Record
D
11320 DUNLEITH PLACE
N. potomac, MD 20878

rkamensh@verizon.net
301-762-7897
Party name: The South Carolina ACLU; The DKT Liberty Project; The Cato Institute, Reason Foundation
H. Jefferson Powell
    Counsel of Record
First Amendment Clinic Duke Law School
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27708-0360

jefferson.powell01@gmail.com
9196137168
Party name: FIRST AMENDMENT CLINICS AT DUKE LAW AND ARIZONA STATE UNIVERSITY LAW

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543