Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-70
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-70
Title:William H. Cosby, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Janice Dickinson
Docketed:July 12, 2018
Linked with 17A1341
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B271470)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:March 14, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 01 2018Application (17A1341) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2018 to July 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 04 2018Application (17A1341) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 12, 2018.
Jul 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah Elisabeth Kelly-Kilgore
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Gross LLP
601 S Figueroa Street
30th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

skellykilgore@ggtriallaw.com
213-334-7065
Party name: William H. Cosby, Jr.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543