Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6992 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6992 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Vide 18-1222
Title:Brandon Bernard, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-70008)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 10, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2019 to February 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 11, 2019.
Jan 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Brandon Bernard.
Blanket Consent
Jan 10 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2019 to March 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 28, 2019.
Mar 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2019 to May 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 17, 2019.
May 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2019 to June 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 21, 2019.
Jun 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2019 to August 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 2, 2019.
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 2, 2019 to October 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2019.
Oct 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 7, 2019 to November 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 1, 2019.
Oct 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2019 to December 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 6, 2019.
Dec 06 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2019Reply of petitioner Brandon Bernard filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 13 2020Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Charles Owen
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Robert C. Owen, LLC
53 W. Jackson Blvd., Ste. 1056
Chicago, IL 60604

robowenlaw@gmail.com
5125778329
Party name: Brandon Bernard
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lawrence J. Fox
    Counsel of Record
Yale Law School
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

lawrence.fox@yale.edu
203-432-9358
Party name: The Ethics Bureau at Yale

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543