Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6884 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6884 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Isaiah Glenndell Tryon, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 30, 2018
Linked with 18A305
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(D-2015-331)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2018Application (18A305) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 21 2018Application (18A305) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 26, 2018.
Nov 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOther
Dec 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 31, 2018 to January 30, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 30, 2019.
Jan 17 2019Brief of respondent State of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrea Digilio Miller
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Cnty. Public Defender
611 County Office Bldg.
320 Robert S. Kerr
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

andrea.miller@oscn.net
405-713-1560
Party name: Isaiah Tryon
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer J. Dickson
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st St.
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State of Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543