Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6882 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6882 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Willie Seth Crain, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:November 30, 2018
Linked with 18A49
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1475)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2018Application (18A49) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2018 to December 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Application (18A49) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 2, 2018.
Nov 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ann Marie Mirialakis
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637

mirialakis@ccmr.state.fl.us
813-558-1600
Party name: Willie Seth Crain, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543