Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6852
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6852
Title:Arnold Bennett Caldwell, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2062)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 27 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jan 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Nov 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sharon Ann Turek
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office, W.D. MI
50 Louis NW
Suite 300
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

sharon_turek@fd.org
616-742-7420
Party name: Arnold Bennett Caldwell
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543