Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6843 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6843 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Milton Dailey, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:November 27, 2018
Linked with 18A208
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1073)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2018Application (18A208) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 27 2018Application (18A208) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 23, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 03 2019Reply of James Milton Dailey not accepted for filing. (January 03, 2019 - Reply to be corrected and re-submitted)
Jan 03 2019Reply of petitioner James Milton Dailey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jan 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julissa R. Fontan
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel- Middle Region
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Tempe Terrace, FL 33637

fontan@ccmr.state.fl.us
(813) 558-1600
Party name: James Milton Dailey
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543