Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6817
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6817
Title:Michael Albert Focia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 26, 2018
Linked with 17A1092
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15643)
   Decision Date:September 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:January 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 20 2018Application (17A1092) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2018 to June 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Application (17A1092) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 2, 2018.
Jun 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Albert FociaPO Box 114
Millbrook, AL 36054

Party name: Michael Albert Focia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543