Docket for 18-672
|
Nov 20 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 24, 2018) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Richard Vos, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 20 2018 | Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 02 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. | | | Jan 09 2019 | Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019) | | | Jan 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 29 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019. See Rule 30.1. | | | Mar 11 2019 | Brief of respondents Richard Vos, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 25 2019 | Reply of petitioners City of Newport Beach, a governmental entity; Richard Henry; Nathan Farris filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019. | | | Apr 15 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019. | | | Apr 22 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019. | | | May 06 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019. | | | May 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. | | | May 20 2019 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|