SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6713 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6713 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Donald Anthony Grant, Petitioner
v.
Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden
Docketed:
November 15, 2018
Linked with 18A283
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(14-6131)
Decision Date:
March 30, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
June 22, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018
Application (18A283) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2018 to November 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Sep 18 2018
Application (18A283) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
Nov 13 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 17, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Dec 10 2018
Brief of respondent Mike Carpenter in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 21 2018
Reply of petitioner Donald Anthony Grant filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 27 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patti Palmer Ghezzi
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
215 Dean A. McGee
Suite 707 Old Post Office Building
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Patti_Ghezzi@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Donald Anthony Grant
Attorneys for Respondent
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hunt
Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105
caroline.hunt@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Mike Carpenter
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##