SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-6701 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-6701 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Roger Dale Epperson, Petitioner
v.
Kentucky
Docketed:
November 14, 2018
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Kentucky
Case Numbers:
(2017-SC-000044-MR)
Decision Date:
August 16, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 14, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Other
Dec 07 2018
Brief of Commonwealth of Kentucky in opposition not accepted for filing. (December 19, 2018)
Dec 13 2018
Brief of respondent Commonwealth of Kentucky in opposition filed.
Main Document
Main Document
Dec 14 2018
Reply of petitioner Roger Epperson filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
Dec 27 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David M. Barron
Counsel of Record
Kentucky Department of Public Advocacy
5 Mill Creek Park
Section 101
Frankfort, KY 40601
davembarron@yahoo.com
6462796902
Party name: Roger Epperson
Attorneys for Respondent
Julie Scott Jernigan
Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
1024 Capital Center Drive
Frankfort, KY 40601
jscottjernigan@grantco.org
502-696-5342
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##