Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6662
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6662
Title:Eddie Lee Shular, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-10234)
   Decision Date:September 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServicePetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendix
Dec 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2019.
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2019 to February 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 13, 2019.
Feb 13 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 13 2019Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Feb 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 11 2019Rescheduled.
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 14 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Eddie Shular filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Jul 18 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 30 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 25, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 22, 2019. The reply brief is to be filed on or before December 20, 2019.
Sep 10 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Eddie Shular.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 13 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Eddie Shular
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Sep 25 2019Brief of petitioner Eddie Shular filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 21, 2020.
Nov 22 2019Brief of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 26 2019CIRCULATED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Michael Summa
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Northern District of Florida
227 N. Bronough Street, Suite 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301-1300

richard_summa@fd.org
(850) 942-8818
Party name: Eddie Shular
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: FAMM
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Michael Scott Vastine
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Clinic, St. Thomas University School of Law
16401 NW 37th Avenue
Miami Gardens, FL 33054

mvastine@stu.edu
3056232340
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association; Catholic Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami; Americans for Immigrant Justice

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543