Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6644
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6644
Title:Jingyuan Feng, Petitioner
v.
Sheena Komenda, et al.
Docketed:November 8, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1286)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:November 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent Rockwell Collins, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jingyuan July Feng640 Colton Circle NE, Unit 9
Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

(612)296-0134
Party name: Jingyuan Feng
Attorneys for Respondents
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

escalia@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8206
Party name: Rockwell Collins, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543