Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6624 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6624 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Farris Genner Morris, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:November 8, 2018
Linked with 18A211
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2017-01700-CCA-R28-PD)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 7, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2018Application (18A211) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 5, 2018 to November 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 24 2018Application (18A211) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 4, 2018.
Nov 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOther
Dec 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelley Jane Henry
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, Middle District of Tennessee
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

kelley_henry@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Farris Genner Morris
Attorneys for Respondent
Leslie E. Price
    Counsel of Record
Tennessee Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Leslie.Price@ag.tn.gov
615-594-7327
Party name: Tennessee

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543