Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-658
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-658
Title:Joel Doe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Boyertown Area School District, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2018
Linked with 18A397
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3113)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 10 2018Application (18A397) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 17 2018Application (18A397) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2018 to January 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2019, for all respondents.
Nov 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Joel Doe, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Women's Liberation Front filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Miriam Grossman, M.D., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Hands Across the Aisle filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Walt Heyer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ryan T. Anderson.(12/26/2018)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of William J. Bennett filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Christian Educators Association International, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Amicus brief of Ryan T. Anderson not accepted for filing. (December 26, 2018)(Corrected version submitted)
Jan 18 2019Brief of respondents Boyertown Area School District, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondent Pennsylvania Youth Congress Foundation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 12 2019Reply of petitioners Joel Doe, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Rescheduled.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Feb 28 2019Rescheduled.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 14 2019Rescheduled.
Mar 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Joel Doe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael I. Levin
    Counsel of Record
Levin Legal Group, P.C.
1800 Byberry Road, Suite 1301
Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006

mlevin@levinlegalgroup.com
215-913-6378
Party name: Boyertown Area School District, et al.
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

rmar@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: Pennsylvania Youth Congress Foundation
Other
Dean Robert Broyles
    Counsel of Record
The National Center for Law and Policy
539 West Grand Avenue
Escondido, CA 92025

dbroyles@nclplaw.org
7607474529
Party name: Ryan T. Anderson
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: William J. Bennett
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: The Institute for Faith and Family
Thomas William Parker Douglas
    Counsel of Record
2057 Lakeway Drive
Holland, MI 49423

parkerdouglas66@gmail.com
801-699-7746
Party name: Miriam Grossman, M.D., Paul Hruz, Ph.D., M.D., Michael Laidlaw, M.D., Quentin Van Meter, M.D., and Andre Van Mol, M.D.
L. Theodore Hoppe Jr.
    Counsel of Record
L. Theodore Hoppe, Jr., Esquire - Attorney at Law
2 S. Orange Street
Suite 215
Media, PA 19063

thoppe@thoppelaw.com
6104973579
Party name: Women's Liberation Front
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Aaron Diego Martin
    Counsel of Record
Mette, Evans & Woodside
3401 North Front Street
P.O. Box 5950
Harrisburg, PA 17110-0950

admartin@mette.com
7172325000
Party name: Hands Across the Aisle
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

eb8181@yahoo.com
917-826-8469
Party name: Christian Educators Association International, et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Gregory H. Teufel
    Counsel of Record
OGC Law, LLC
615 Washington Road
Suite 405
Pittsburgh, PA 15228

gteufel@ogclaw.net
4122534622
Party name: Walt Heyer

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543