Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-654
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-654
Title:Philip Morris USA Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Boatright, et ux.
Docketed:November 20, 2018
Linked with 18A247
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Second District
   Case Numbers:(2D15-622)
   Decision Date:April 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 22, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2018Application (18A247) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2018 to November 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Response to application from respondent Richard Boatright and Deborah Boatright filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 14 2018Application (18A247) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Dec 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Philip Morris USA Inc. and Liggett Group LLC.
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondents Richard Boatright and Deborah Boatright in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Reply of petitioners Philip Morris USA Inc. and Liggett Group LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: Philip Morris USA Inc. and Liggett Group LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Celene Harrell Humphries
    Counsel of Record
Bannock & Humphries
1111 West Cass St., Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33606

chumphries@bhappeals.com
(813) 223-4300
Party name: Richard Boatright and Deborah Boatright
Other
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Tort Reform Association and National Association of Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543