Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-650
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-650
Title:Miguel Cabrera-Rangel, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 20, 2018
Linked with 18A269
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-41123)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2018Application (18A269) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 7, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Sep 14 2018Application (18A269) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 6, 2018.
Oct 17 2018Application (18A269) to extend further the time from November 6, 2018 to December 6, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Application (18A269) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 6, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Miguel Cabrera-Rangel.
Blanket Consent
Nov 28 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Association Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Cato Institute GRANTED.
Jan 14 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Miguel Cabrera-Rangel
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Donna F. Coltharp
    Counsel of Record
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL DEFENDERS
850 West Adams Street Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

donna_coltharp@fd.org
602-382-2767
Party name: THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FEDERAL DEFENDERS
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
202-626-5552
Party name: Due Process Institute
Kayleigh Marie Scalzo
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth St. NW
Washington, DC 20001

kscalzo@cov.com
2026625133
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543