Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-649
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-649
Title:R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Cheryl Searcy, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol LaSard
Docketed:November 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-15258)
   Decision Date:September 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Dec 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Philip Morris USA Inc..
Blanket Consent
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondent Cheryl Searcy, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol LaSard in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Reply of petitioners R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Philip Morris USA Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8257
Party name: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Philip Morris USA Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
2129986580
Party name: Cheryl Searcy, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Carol LaSard
Other
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Tort Reform Association and National Association of Manufacturers

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543