Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6369
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6369
Title:Lashon Browning, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 17, 2018
Linked with 18A170
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2514)
   Decision Date:May 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2018Application (18A170) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2018 to October 18, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Application (18A170) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 18, 2018.
Oct 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018.
Dec 17 2018Brief of memorandum United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Stokeling v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2019).
Mar 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William H Theis
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
55 E. Monroe St.
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60603

william_theis@fd.org
312.621.8300
Party name: Lashon Browning
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543