Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6210
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6210
Title:Gerald P. Mitchell, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:October 4, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2015AP304)
   Decision Date:July 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 5, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Dec 05 2018Brief of respondent Wisconsin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Reply of petitioner Gerald P. Mitchell filed. (Distributed)
OtherMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 23, 2019
Feb 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerald P. Mitchell.
Blanket Consent
Feb 18 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Wisconsin
Blanket Consent
Feb 25 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief of petitioner Gerald P. Mitchell filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Brief amicus curiae of California DUI Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of National College for DUI Defense, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Supplemental proof of service of amicus California DUI Lawyers Association filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of The Rutherford Institute and the Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Restore the Fourth, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of The DKT Liberty Project, Reason Foundation, and The Due Process Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Wisconsin filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of DUI Defense Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 27 2019Brief of respondent Wisconsin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mothers Against Drunk Driving filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of League of Wisconsin Municipalities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Colorado, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2019Reply of petitioner Gerald P. Mitchell filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2019Argued. For petitioner: Andrew R. Hinkel, Assistant State Public Defender, Madison, Wis. For respondent: Hannah S. Jurss, Assistant Attorney General, Madison, Wis.
Jun 27 2019Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., announced the judgment of the Court and delivered an opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in the judgment. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg and Kagan, JJ., joined. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jul 29 2019MANDATE SSUED.
Jul 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Robert Hinkel
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin State Public Defender
17 South Fairchild Street, Third Floor
Madison, WI 53703

hinkela@opd.wi.gov
(608) 267-1779
Party name: Gerald P. Mitchell
Attorneys for Respondent
Anthony David Russomanno
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707

russomannoad@doj.state.wi.us
6082672230
Party name: Wisconsin
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: The DKT Liberty Project, Reason Foundation, and The Due Process Institute
Donald Joseph Bartell
    Counsel of Record
Bartell, Hensel & Gressley
5053 La Mart Drive
Suite 201
Riverside, CA 92507

djbartell@pacbell.net
9517882230
Party name: California DUI Lawyers Association
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
202-675-2330
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AND ACLU OF WISCONSIN
L. Andrew Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Colorado Attorney General
1300 Broadway St.
Denver, CO 80203

andrew.cooper@coag.gov
720-508-6465
Party name: State of Colorado et al.
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Suite 2000
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@dbr.com
215-988-2700
Party name: The Rutherford Institute and the Cato Institute
Douglas James Hoffer
    Counsel of Record
City of Eau Claire
203 S. Farwell St.
Eau Claire, WI 54702

douglashoffer@gmail.com
2624242759
Party name: League of Wisconsin Municipalities, et al.
D. Timothy Huey
    Counsel of Record
3240 West Henderson Road
Columbus, OH 43220

DTHLAW@gmail.com
614-498-8667
Party name: DUI Defense Lawyers Association
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher, LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7726
Party name: Mothers Against Drunk Driving
Lauren Suzanne Kuley
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
201 E. Fourth St. Suite 1900
Cincinnati, OH 45202

lauren.kuley@squirepb.com
513-361-1200
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al
Donald John Ramsell
    Counsel of Record
Ramsell & Associates LLC
128 S. County Farm Rd
Wheaton, IL 60187-2400

donald.ramsell@dialdui.com
6306658780
Party name: National College for DUI Defense, Inc.
Mahesha Padmanabhan Subbaraman
    Counsel of Record
Subbaraman PLLC
222 S. 9th St., Suite 1600
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mps@subblaw.com
612-315-9210
Party name: Restore the Fourth, Inc.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543