Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6189
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6189
Title:Eduardo Salgado, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B282368)
   Decision Date:February 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:May 23, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
Petition
Oct 19 2018Waiver of right of respondent State Of California to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kent Darroch Young
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices Of Kent D. Young
501 W. Broadway, Suite A526
San Diego, CA 92101

kentdyoung@outlook.com
6197934924
Party name: Eduardo Salgado
Attorneys for Respondent
Gary A. Lieberman
    Counsel of Record
California Attorney General's Office
300 South Spring Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

Party name: State Of California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543