Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6177
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6177
Title:Tony Lipscomb, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 2, 2018
Linked with 18A92
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2233)
   Decision Date:May 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2018Application (18A92) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 1, 2018 to September 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Application (18A92) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 1, 2018.
Sep 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 1, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Dec 03 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED in light of Stokeling v. United States, 586 U. S. ___ (2019).
Mar 29 2019JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William H Theis
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
55 E. Monroe St.
Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60603

william_theis@fd.org
312.621.8300
Party name: Tony Lipscomb
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543