Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-61
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-61
Title:Stand Up for California!, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:July 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5327, 16-5328)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Waiver of right of respondent Department of the Interior, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2018Waiver of right of respondent North Fork Rancheria of Mono Indians to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 29 2018Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2018)
Sep 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2018 to October 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2018.
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2018 to October 29, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 29, 2018, for all respondents.
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 26, 2018, for all respondents.
Nov 26 2018Brief of respondent North Fork Rancheria of Mono Indians in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 10 2018Reply of petitioners Stand Up for California!, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 02 2019Letter of December 31, 2018, from counsel for respondent North Fork Rancheria of Mono Indians received.
Jan 07 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Sean M. Sherlock
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer
600 Anton Blvd.
Suite 1400
Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ssherlock@swlaw.com
(714) 427-7000
Party name: Stand Up for California!, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of the Interior, et al.
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: North Fork Rancheria of Mono Indians

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543