Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6098
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6098
Title:Joe Johnson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:September 25, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-343)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 25, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 14 2018Response Requested. (Due December 14, 2018)
Dec 14 2018Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 09 2019Reply of petitioner Joe Johnson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019..
Jul 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/8/2020.
Jul 09 2020Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of McGirt v. Oklahoma, 591 U. S. ___ (2020).
Aug 10 2020MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 10 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joe Johnson Jr.096004
Joseph Harp Correctional Center
P.O. Box 548
Lexington, OK 73051-0548

Party name: Joe Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543