Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6075 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6075 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Daniel Clate Acker, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 21, 2018
Linked with 18A310
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-56,841-06)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2018Application (18A310) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Sep 25 2018Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Response to application from respondent Texas filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 25 2018Reply of petitioner Daniel C. Acker filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Application (18A310) referred to the Court.
Sep 27 2018Petition DENIED.
Sep 27 2018Application (18A310) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 MAGEE AVE
MILL VALLEY, CA 94941-4532

a.r.ellis@att.net
415-389-6771
Party name: Daniel Acker
Attorneys for Respondent
Ellen Stewart-Klein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548
Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711-2548

ellen.stewart-klein@oag.texas.gov
5125370147
Party name: State of Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543