Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-6025
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-6025
Title:Rene Borrero, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 18, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14010)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 18, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Rene Borrero filed.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to November 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rene Borrero#67381-018
FCI Coleman
PO Box 1032
Coleman, FL 33521

Party name: Rene Borrero
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543