Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5940
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5940
Title:Moises Perez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3419)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 14, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 12, 2018)
PetitionAppendixAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Oct 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2018 to November 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Claire Roxanne Cahoon
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender Northern Dist. of OH
617 Adams Street
Toledo, OH 43604

claire_cahoon@fd.org
4192597370
Party name: Moises Perez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543