Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5838
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5838
Title:Hosea Swopes, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 30, 2018
Linked with 17A1402
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1797)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 12 2018Application (17A1402) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2018 to August 26, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 25 2018Application (17A1402) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 26, 2018.
Aug 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 31, 2018.
Oct 31 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nanci McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office
1010 Market
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63101

nanci_mccarthy@fd.org
3142411255
Party name: Hosea Latron Swopes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543