Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5810
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5810
Title:Laureano Chirino Rivera, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12618)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 28, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 06 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Oct 16 2018Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Rehearing DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laureano Chirino Rivera#79091-004
F.C.C.
Housing Unit V.B., P.O. Box 26020
Beaumont, TX 77720-6020

Party name: Laureano Rivera Rivera
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United states

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543