Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5793 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5793 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ray Lamar Johnston, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:August 28, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1678)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Sep 27 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 12 2018Reply of petitioner Ray Johnston filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari: I concur for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Thomas, J., concurring). Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Dixon Hendry
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel- Middle Region "CCRC-M"
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637

hendry@ccmr.state.fl.us
8135581600
Party name: Ray Johnston
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Offifce of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543