Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5781
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5781
Title:Larry Dean Dusenbery, Petitioner
v.
Ronnie R. Holt, Warden
Docketed:August 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1148)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Sep 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 26, 2018 to October 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 26, 2018.
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 26, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 26, 2018.
Nov 26 2018Memorandum of respondent Holt, Warden, Ronnie R. filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 13 2018Reply of petitioner Larry D. Dusenbery filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Larry Dean Dusenbery#50908-060
U.S.P. Allenwood
P.O. Box 3000
White Deer, PA 17887

Party name: Larry D. Dusenbery
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Holt, Warden, Ronnie R.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543