Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5760
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5760
Title:William Benjamin Brown, Petitioner
v.
Andrew Mansukhani, Warden
Docketed:August 24, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-7268)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 24, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent Mansukhani, Warden to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Response Requested. (Due October 18, 2018)
Oct 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2018 to November 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 19, 2018.
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent Mansukhani, Warden in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 04 2019Reply of petitioner William Benjamin Brown filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Benjamin Brown#16860-021
FCI
P.O.Box 699
Estill, SC 29918

Party name: William Benjamin Brown
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Mansukhani, Warden

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543