Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-573
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-573
Title:Colony Cove Properties, LLC, Petitioner
v.
City of Carson, California, et al.
Docketed:November 1, 2018
Linked with 18A282
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56255)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 3, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2018Application (18A282) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 1, 2018 to October 31, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Application (18A282) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 31, 2018.
Oct 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 03 2018Brief amici curiae of NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Brief of Carson, CA, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Brief of Carson, CA, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Colony Cove Properties, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Sanaz K. Soltani
    Counsel of Record
Aleshire and Wynder, LLP
18881 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 1700
Irvine, CA 92612

ssoltani@awattorneys.com
949-223-1170
Party name: Carson, CA, et al.
Other
Michael M. Berger
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
LOS ANGELES, CA 90064

mmberger@manatt.com
(310) 312-4185
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 Northeast 33rd PLace, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
425-576-0484
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Luke Anthony Wake
    Counsel of Record
NFIB Small Business Legal Center
1201 F St. N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

luke.wake@nfib.org
202-314-2061
Party name: NFIB Small Business Legal Center, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543