Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-566
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-566
Title:Heriberto Menendez, Petitioner
v.
Marshall Garber
Docketed:October 31, 2018
Linked with 18A176
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3992)
   Decision Date:May 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Application (18A176) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2018 to October 29, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Application (18A176) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 29, 2018.
Oct 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 30, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 13 2018Response Requested. (Due January 14, 2019)
Jan 14 2019Brief of respondent Marshall Garber in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Reply of petitioner Heriberto Menendez, M.D. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Heriberto Menendez, M.D.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob James Beausay
    Counsel of Record
Beausay Law Firm
PO Box 1176
Powell, OH 43065

jjb@beausaylaw.com
614-785-6193
Party name: Marshall Garber

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543