Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5612
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5612
Title:Detrick C. Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15686)
   Decision Date:May 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 17, 2018)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Sep 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2018 to October 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 17, 2018.
Oct 17 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Danli Song
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender, Middle District
201 South Orange Avenue
Orlando, FL 32801

danli_song@fd.org
4076486338
Party name: Detrick Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543