Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5518 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5518 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Norman Mearle Grim, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:August 8, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1071)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 7, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Reply of petitioner Norman Grim filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 03 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari: I concur for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Thomas, J., concurring). Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Reynolds v. Florida, 586 U. S. ___ (2018) (Sotomayor, J., dissenting).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Billy H. Nolas
    Counsel of Record
227 N. Bronough Street
Ste. 4200
Tallahassee, FL 32301

billy_nolas@fd.org
850-942-8818
Party name: Norman Grim
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543