Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-540
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-540
Title:Leslie Rutledge, Attorney General of Arkansas, Petitioner
v.
Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Docketed:October 24, 2018
Linked with 18A130
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1609)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2018Application (18A130) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 03 2018Application (18A130) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 8, 2018.
Sep 26 2018Application (18A130) to extend further the time from October 8, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Application (18A130) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2018 to January 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2019.
Nov 21 2018Brief amici curiae of States of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2019 to January 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 24, 2019.
Jan 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 24, 2019 to February 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 28, 2019.
Feb 28 2019Brief of respondent Pharmaceutical Care Management Association in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2019Reply of petitioner Leslie Rutledge, Attorney General of Arkansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Dec 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 17 2019Supplemental brief of respondent Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 10 2020Petition GRANTED.
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 27, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Brief of petitioner Leslie Rutledge filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2020Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioner Leslie Rutledge.
Feb 24 2020Joint appendix (Volume I) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Mar 02 2020Motion for leave to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED.
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of States of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Community Oncology Alliance, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Chain Drug Stores, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Council of Insurance Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of Arkansas Pharmacists Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of FMI and Twenty-Three Retail Trade Associations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Specialty Pharmacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of Alliance for Transparent and Affordable Prescriptions filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amicus curiae of AIDS Healthcare Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation supporting neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Brief amici curiae of American Medical Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 03 2020Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. (1-Box)
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 25 2020Brief of respondent Pharmaceutical Care Management Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of America's Health Insurance Plans, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Society for Human Resource Management filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Employers Health Purchasing Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amicus curiae of Academy of Managed Care Pharmacy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the American Benefits Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for the October Term 2020.
Apr 20 2020Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 24 2020Reply of petitioner Leslie Rutledge filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 6, 2020.
Oct 06 2020Argued. For petitioner: Nicholas J. Bronni, Solicitor General, Little Rock, Ark.; and Frederick Liu, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Seth P. Waxman, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas, Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72223

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
5016826302
Party name: Leslie Rutledge
Attorneys for Respondent
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Michael B. KimberlyMcDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Dean RichlinFoley Hoag LLP
155 Seaport Blvd.
Boston, MA 02210

drichlin@foleyhoag.com
617-832-1140
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Other
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jack R. Bierig
    Counsel of Record
233 S. Wacker Drive
Suite 7300
Chicago, IL 60606

jbierig@schiffhardin.com
312-258-5511
Party name: American Medical Association, et al.
Laura Riley Boudreau
    Counsel of Record
AIDS Healthcare Foundation
6255 W. Sunset Boulevard, 21st Fl.
Los Angeles, CA 90028

laura.boudreau@aidshealth.org
3233651308
Party name: AIDS Healthcare Foundation
William Edgar Copley III
    Counsel of Record
Weisbrod Matteis and Copley PLLC
1200 New Hampshire Ave. NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

wcopley@wmclaw.com
202-499-7900
Party name: FMI and Twenty-Three Retail Trade Associations
Karli Ann EisenbergCalifornia Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

karli.eisenberg@doj.ca.gov
9162107913
Party name: States of California, et al.
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
(312) 853-7875
Party name: Academy of Managed Care Pharmacy
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose & Jefferson LLP
Walnut Glen Tower
8144 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75231

dgeyser@adjtlaw.com
214-396-0441
Party name: Alliance for Transparent and Affordable Prescriptions
Richard B. Lapp
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
131 S. Dearbord Sreet
Suite 2400
Chicago, IL 60603

rlapp@seyfarth.com
(630) 247-9806
Party name: Society for Human Resource Management
Jonathan E Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Frier Levitt
84 Bloomfield Avenue
Pine Brook, NJ 07058

jlevitt@frierlevitt.com
973-618-1660
Party name: Community Oncology Alliance, Inc., et al.
Robert M. Palumbos
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
30 South 17th Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rmpalumbos@duanemorris.com
215-979-1111
Party name: National Association of Specialty Pharmacy
Joshua Patashnik
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

josh.patashnik@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3896
Party name: States of California, et al.
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: Employers Health Purchasing Corporation
Howard R. Rubin
    Counsel of Record
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
2900 K Street, NW
Suit 200
Washington, DC 20007

howard.rubin@katten.com
202-625-3534
Party name: Arkansas Pharmacists Association, National Community Pharmacists Association, American Pharmacists Association, National Alliance of State Pharmacy Associations, et al.
Nathaniel Saul Shapo
    Counsel of Record
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
525 West Monroe Street
Chicago, IL 60661

nat.shapo@katten.com
312-902-5273
Party name: National Council of Insurance Legislators
Anthony F. Shelley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

ashelley@milchev.com
202-626-5800
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans, Inc.
Dara Swartz Smith
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E St, . NW
Washington, DC 20049

dsmith@aarp.org
12024346280
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Mark David Spencer
    Counsel of Record
McAfee & Taft
10th Floor Two Leadership Square
211 N Robinson
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

mark.spencer@mcafeetaft.com
(405) 235-9621
Party name: J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc.
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: National Association of Chain Drug Stores, Inc.
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3599
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the American Benefits Council

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543