Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-54
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-54
Title:William A. Dabbs, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Docketed:July 10, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(23, September Term, 2017)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute and Reason Foundation filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 09 2018Brief of respondent Anne Arundel County, Maryland in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Reply of petitioner William Dabbs, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Trevor Hodges
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
10940 Northeast 33rd PLace, Suite 210
Bellevue, WA 98004

bth@pacificlegal.org
425-576-0484
Party name: William Dabbs, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mitchell Y. Mirviss
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
750 East Pratt Street, Suite 900
Baltimore, MD 21202

mymirviss@venable.com
(410) 244-7400
Party name: Anne Arundel County, Maryland
Other
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
202-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute and Reason Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543