Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5288
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5288
Title:Robert Serrano, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2068)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendix
Aug 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 20, 2018 to September 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 19, 2018.
Sep 19 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter Elliot Edwards
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
506 S. Main St., Suite 400
Las Cruces, NM 88001

peter_edwards@fd.org
575-527-6930
Party name: Robert Serrano
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543