Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5232
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5232
Title:Charles Lynch Pettis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3988)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2018 to September 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Sep 17 2018Memorandum in opposition of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Rabea Jamal Zayed
    Counsel of Record
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
50 South Sixth Street
Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402

zayed.rj@dorsey.com
612-492-6711
Party name: Charles Lynch Pettis
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543