SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 18-5231 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 18-5231 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Richard Lloyd Odom, Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:
July 17, 2018
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Tennessee, Western Division
Case Numbers:
(W2017-01027-CCA-R28-PD)
Decision Date:
October 20, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
April 23, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Aug 16 2018
Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed.
Main Document
Aug 30 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Deborah Yvonne Drew
Counsel of Record
Tennessee Office of the Post-Conviction Defender
PO Box 198068
Nashville, TN 37219
DrewD@tnpcdo.net
6157419331
Party name: Richard Lloyd Odom
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Thomas Hinkle
Counsel of Record
Tennessee Attorney General & Reporter
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
zachary.hinkle@ag.tn.gov
6155320986
Party name: Tennessee
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##