Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5228 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5228 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Quawn M. Franklin, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 13, 2018
Linked with 17A1080
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-824)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2018Application (17A1080) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2018 to July 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 12 2018Application (17A1080) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 15, 2018.
Jul 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 13, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Aug 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Rescheduled.
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maria Christine Perinetti
    Counsel of Record
12973 North Telecom Parkway
Temple Terrace, FL 33637

perinetti@ccmr.state.fl.us
(813)558-1600
Party name: Quawn M. Franklin
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen D. Ake
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607

stephen.ake@myfloridalegal.com
8132877910
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543