Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5181 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5181 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Michael Gordon Reynolds, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 9, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-793)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 8, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Sep 21 2018Reply of petitioner Michael Gordon Reynolds filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Breyer respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached). Justice Thomas, concurring in the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion). Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julissa Rosalyn Fontan
    Counsel of Record
Capital Collateral Regional Counsel- Middle Region
12973 N. Telecom Parkway
Tempe Terrace, FL 33637

fontan@ccmr.state.fl.us
8135581600
Party name: Michael Gordon Reynolds
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013

Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
8132877910
Party name: Florida
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney Geneal
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543