Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5160 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5160 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Michael Anthony Tanzi, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:July 9, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-1640)
   Decision Date:April 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 8, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief of respondent State of Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Aug 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 18 2018Rescheduled.
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Edward Kalil
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of the Capital Collateral Regional Coun
1 East Broward Boulevard
Suite 444
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

kalilp@ccsr.state.fl.us
9547131284
Party name: Michael Tanzi
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Andrew Browne
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
3507 E. Frontage Road, Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33607-7013

Scott.Browne@MyFloridaLegal.com
813-287-7910
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543