Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-5092
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-5092
Title:Tyrone Anderson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11424)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 1, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 1, 2018 to August 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 31, 2018.
Aug 31 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tracy M. Dreispul
    Counsel of Record
federal Public DefenderSouthern District of Flor
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1500
Miami, FL 33130

Tracy_Dreispul@fd.org
305-536-6900
Party name: Tyrone Anderson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543