Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-495
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-495
Title:Morris & Associates, Inc., Petitioner
v.
John Bean Technologies Corporation
Docketed:October 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1502)
   Decision Date:April 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2018Brief of respondent John Bean Technologies Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Reply of petitioner Morris & Associates, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Norman Andrew Crain
    Counsel of Record
Thomas Horstemeyer LLP
3200 Windy Hill Road, Suite 1600E
Atlanta, GA 30339

andrew.crain@thomashorstemeyer.com
(770) 933-9500
Party name: Morris & Associates, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gary D. Marts Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Lindsey & Jennings, LLP
200 W. Capitol Ave., Ste. 2300
Little Rock, AR 72201

gmarts@wlj.com
501-371-0808
Party name: John Bean Technologies Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543